TX HB2146 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the punishment of certain controlled substance offenses committed in a drug-free zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the punishment of certain controlled substance offenses committed in a drug-free zone.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback