TX HB2142 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to definitions for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to definitions for purposes of gambling criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs
2023-03-09HouseRead first time
2023-02-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback