TX HB2142 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to preauthorization requirements and examinations of certain health benefit plan issuers.
Title
Relating to preauthorization requirements and examinations of certain health benefit plan issuers.
Sponsors
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Life, Health & Accident
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Life, Health & Accident