TX HB2136 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to marine vessel projects in the diesel emissions reduction incentive program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to marine vessel projects in the diesel emissions reduction incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#751 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#751
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2136
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02136I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02136H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02136E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02136S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02136I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02136H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02136H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02136E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02136E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2136&RcdVtNo=751&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021

Bill Comments

feedback