TX HB2135 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coverage for certain services relating to postpartum depression under the medical assistance and CHIP perinatal programs.
Title
Relating to coverage for certain services relating to postpartum depression under the medical assistance and CHIP perinatal programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Children's Insurance
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women