TX HB2134 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to coverage for childhood cranial remolding orthosis under certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to coverage for childhood cranial remolding orthosis under certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1175 (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1175
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback