TX HB213 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to jury instructions regarding parole eligibility and the release on parole of certain inmates convicted of an offense committed when younger than 18 years of age; changing parole eligibility.
Title
Relating to jury instructions regarding parole eligibility and the release on parole of certain inmates convicted of an offense committed when younger than 18 years of age; changing parole eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#686 (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amended RV#651 (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amended RV#651 (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#686 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#651 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-19 | House | Returned to committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2023-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
GOOD CONDUCT TIME
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
SENATOR EDDIE LUCIO JR. ACT
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
GOOD CONDUCT TIME
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
SENATOR EDDIE LUCIO JR. ACT