TX HB2126 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the franchise tax rate applicable to certain taxable entities that sell telephone prepaid calling cards.
Title
Relating to the franchise tax rate applicable to certain taxable entities that sell telephone prepaid calling cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#350 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#350 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 1/1/18 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |