TX HB2119 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of restaurants and third-party food delivery services, including the issuance of certain alcoholic beverage certificates to restaurants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of restaurants and third-party food delivery services, including the issuance of certain alcoholic beverage certificates to restaurants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB911 (Same As) 2021-06-04 - Effective on 1/1/22

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback