TX HB2119 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Title
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1683 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#620 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#620 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1683 |
2019-05-22 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#620 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2131 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--General
LOANS
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--General
LOANS
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS