TX HB2116 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain agreements by architects and engineers in or in connection with certain construction contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain agreements by architects and engineers in or in connection with certain construction contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1591 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#379 (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1591
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Powell
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#379
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2116
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02116I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02116H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02116E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02116S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02116F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02116S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02116I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02116H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02116H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02116E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02116E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02116F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2116&RcdVtNo=379&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2116&RcdVtNo=1591&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback