TX HB2111 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rate filing requirements for certain personal lines insurers with low market shares.
Title
Relating to rate filing requirements for certain personal lines insurers with low market shares.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-04-23 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 965 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Effective on 9/1/21