TX HB2111 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the period for which a school district's participation in certain tax increment financing reinvestment zones may be taken into account in determining the total taxable value of property in the school district.
Title
Relating to the period for which a school district's participation in certain tax increment financing reinvestment zones may be taken into account in determining the total taxable value of property in the school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#707 (Y: 91 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#707 (Y: 91 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#707 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous