TX HB211 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarette vapor products; imposing taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sales and use taxes on e-cigarette vapor products; imposing taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-07 - House - Passed RV#886 (Y: 84 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Amended RV#840 (Y: 84 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#886
2021-05-07HousePassed
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#840
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-07HouseAmended 2-Sanford
2021-05-07HouseAmended 1-Thierry
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseOriginal bill distributed 6:49PM
2021-05-04HouseOriginal bill ordered printed
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-04HouseReturned to Calendars Committee
2021-05-04HousePoint of order sustained Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB211
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00211I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00211H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00211E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00211H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00211H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00211I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00211H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00211H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB211&RcdVtNo=840&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB211&RcdVtNo=886&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback