TX HB2103 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain water planning entities to hold an open or closed meeting by telephone conference call or videoconference call.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain water planning entities to hold an open or closed meeting by telephone conference call or videoconference call.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB859 (Similar To) 2021-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
SB859 (Similar To) 2021-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback