TX HB2087 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development of healthy nutrition and physical activity guidelines for licensed child-care providers, public school teachers, and public school administrators.
Title
Relating to the development of healthy nutrition and physical activity guidelines for licensed child-care providers, public school teachers, and public school administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
INTERAGENCY OBESITY COUNCIL
NUTRITION
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
INTERAGENCY OBESITY COUNCIL
NUTRITION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2087 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02087I.htm |