TX HB2082 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to developing a program to provide telemedicine medical services to certain children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to developing a program to provide telemedicine medical services to certain children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-15 - House - HB 2082Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-05-18SenateRead first time
2015-05-18SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-17HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-15HouseRecord vote
2015-05-15HousePassed
2015-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-03-13HouseRead first time
2015-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback