TX HB2081 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to motor vehicle accidents involving a pedestrian or other vulnerable road user within the area of a crosswalk; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle accidents involving a pedestrian or other vulnerable road user within the area of a crosswalk; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1055 (Same As) 2021-04-09 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback