TX HB2081 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the physician assistant board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the physician assistant board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2015-05-12HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2015-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-07HouseRecord vote
2015-05-07HouseRules suspended
2015-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-03-13HouseRead first time
2015-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback