TX HB2081 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Postponed

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Racing Commission, the abolishment of the Equine Research Account Advisory Committee, and the authority of Texas AgriLife Research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Racing Commission, the abolishment of the Equine Research Account Advisory Committee, and the authority of Texas AgriLife Research.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-14 Postponed
2009-05-14 Laid out as postponed business
2009-05-14 Postponed
2009-05-14 Laid out as postponed business
2009-05-14 Postponed
2009-05-14 Laid out as postponed business
2009-05-12 Postponed
2009-05-12 Read 2nd time
2009-05-12 Placed on Major State Calendar
2009-05-08 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-28 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-28 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-27 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-23 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-23 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-23 Considered in formal meeting
2009-04-23 Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2009-04-01 Left pending in committee
2009-04-01 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-01 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-01 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-01 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-09 Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2009-03-09 Read first time
2009-03-02 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB1013 (Same As) 2009-05-18 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback