TX HB2077 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR96 (Enabling for) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
DAMON ALLEN ACT
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS
SHERIFFS
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
DAMON ALLEN ACT
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS
SHERIFFS