TX HB2073 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to quarantine leave for fire fighters, peace officers, detention officers, and emergency medical technicians employed by, appointed by, or elected for a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to quarantine leave for fire fighters, peace officers, detention officers, and emergency medical technicians employed by, appointed by, or elected for a political subdivision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1665 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Amended RV#92 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1665
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-07HouseRecord vote RV#92
2021-04-07HousePassed as amended
2021-04-07HouseAmended 1-Burrows
2021-04-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-06HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HousePosting rule suspended
2021-03-15HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1401 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2073
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02073I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02073H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02073E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02073S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02073F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02073H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02073I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02073H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02073E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02073E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02073S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02073S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02073F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2073&RcdVtNo=92&Ch=H&Dt=04/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=93
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2073&RcdVtNo=1665&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback