TX HB2068 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemption from jury service of tribal council members of and legislative employees for certain tribal governments.
Title
Relating to exemption from jury service of tribal council members of and legislative employees for certain tribal governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1048 (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1048 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |