TX HB2058 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the standards for attorneys representing indigent defendants in capital cases.
Title
Relating to the standards for attorneys representing indigent defendants in capital cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Terri Hodge [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-06 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-04 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Passed | |
2009-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-04 | Record vote | |
2009-05-04 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-04 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time | |
2009-04-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-07 | Record vote | |
2009-04-07 | Passed | |
2009-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-25 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-10 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Same As) 2009-04-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar