TX HB2056 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to access by the division of workers' compensation to certain designated doctor contracts under the workers' compensation system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to access by the division of workers' compensation to certain designated doctor contracts under the workers' compensation system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenatePassed
2017-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-01SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback