TX HB2054 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal and county regulation of sex parlors, including the imposition of civil and criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to municipal and county regulation of sex parlors, including the imposition of civil and criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-26 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUALLY ORIENTED BUSINESSES