TX HB2053 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to individuals and organizations providing certain services and liability in connection with prescribed burns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to individuals and organizations providing certain services and liability in connection with prescribed burns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1861 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#539 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1861
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#539
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback