TX HB2040 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to special open season hunting of certain migratory game birds by veterans and members of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Title
Relating to special open season hunting of certain migratory game birds by veterans and members of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 675 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-04-23 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Same As) 2021-05-30 - Effective immediately