TX HB204 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to school districts and open-enrollment charter schools providing panic alert devices in classrooms.
Title
Relating to school districts and open-enrollment charter schools providing panic alert devices in classrooms.
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ALERT SYSTEM
ALYSSA'S LAW
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
ALYSSA'S LAW
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES