TX HB204 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of instruction about mental health in the required curriculum for public school students.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of instruction about mental health in the required curriculum for public school students.
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2281 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB204 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00204I.htm |