TX HB204 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to cardiac assessments of high school participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cardiac assessments of high school participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-08-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback