TX HB2039 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to persons authorized to conduct a marriage ceremony.
Title
Relating to persons authorized to conduct a marriage ceremony.
Sponsors
Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#242 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amended RV#217 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Amended RV#217 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#242 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#217 |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended 1-Talarico |
2021-04-14 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |