TX HB2036 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
PATIENT PROTECTION & AFFORDABLE CARE ACT
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
PATIENT PROTECTION & AFFORDABLE CARE ACT