TX HB2030 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-30 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-30 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board of a grant program for regional postsecondary education collaboratives.
Title
Relating to the establishment by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board of a grant program for regional postsecondary education collaboratives.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#539 (Y: 99 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 2nd time RV#515 (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#539 (Y: 99 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Read 2nd time RV#515 (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#539 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#515 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2111 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Higher Education
SB2111 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Higher Education
SB2111 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS