TX HB2014 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reimbursement for jury service.
Title
Relating to reimbursement for jury service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#613 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#613 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended 1-Vasut |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |