TX HB2013 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to tuition and laboratory fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain volunteer firefighters enrolled in fire science courses.
Title
Relating to tuition and laboratory fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain volunteer firefighters enrolled in fire science courses.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. James Keffer [R] | Rep. Tim Kleinschmidt [R] |
Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Yvonne Toureilles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-11 | Amended | |
2009-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-08 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-08 | Amended | |
2009-05-08 | Amended | |
2009-05-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer