TX HB2008 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that taxing units may impose on the residence homesteads of individuals who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that taxing units may impose on the residence homesteads of individuals who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR77 (Enabling for) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
HB322 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback