TX HB200 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 71-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain prohibited abortions and the treatment and disposition of a human fetus, human fetal tissue, and embryonic and fetal tissue remains; creating a civil cause of action; imposing a civil penalty; creating criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain prohibited abortions and the treatment and disposition of a human fetus, human fetal tissue, and embryonic and fetal tissue remains; creating a civil cause of action; imposing a civil penalty; creating criminal offenses.

Sponsors

Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]
Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]
Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback