TX HB20 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the state highway fund and to the management and investment of the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the Texas legacy distribution fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocation of certain constitutional transfers of money to the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the state highway fund and to the management and investment of the economic stabilization fund, the Texas legacy fund, and the Texas legacy distribution fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#601 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#548 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#601
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-24HousePostponed 4/24/19 11:45 AM
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#548
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR10 (Enabling for) 2019-04-24 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback