TX HB2 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ad valorem taxation; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ad valorem taxation; authorizing fees.

Sponsors

Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-04-30HouseCompanion considered in lieu of CSSB 2
2019-04-24HousePostponed 4/30/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-24HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-15HousePostponed 4/24/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-11HousePostponed 4/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2019-04-08HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-28HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2019-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-11HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - See remarks for effective date

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback