TX HB1999 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a violation regarding the purchase, possession, or consumption of alcoholic beverages by a minor or the misrepresentation of age by a minor; authorizing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a violation regarding the purchase, possession, or consumption of alcoholic beverages by a minor or the misrepresentation of age by a minor; authorizing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#927 (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback