TX HB1992 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting telemarketers from transmitting misleading caller identification information or otherwise misrepresenting the origin of a telemarketing call.
Title
Relating to prohibiting telemarketers from transmitting misleading caller identification information or otherwise misrepresenting the origin of a telemarketing call.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] |
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1182 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1182 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1182 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TELEMARKETING
Business & Commerce--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TELEMARKETING