TX HB1988 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Summary
Relating to the duties of a peace officer and the Department of Public Safety in connection with the suspension of a driver's license for a failure to pass a blood or breath test for intoxication or the presence of alcohol.
Title
Relating to the duties of a peace officer and the Department of Public Safety in connection with the suspension of a driver's license for a failure to pass a blood or breath test for intoxication or the presence of alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed as amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment amended | |
2009-05-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4177 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Public Safety
Subjects
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID