TX HB1983 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-20)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of a first responder for workers' compensation benefits for post-traumatic stress disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of a first responder for workers' compensation benefits for post-traumatic stress disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#556 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback