TX HB1976 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study of the use of a patient-reported outcomes registry in conjunction with health coverage for certain governmental employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study of the use of a patient-reported outcomes registry in conjunction with health coverage for certain governmental employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#677 (Y: 126 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#615 (Y: 120 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to Pensions
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback