TX HB1972 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the model training curriculum and required training for certain school district peace officers and school resource officers.
Title
Relating to the model training curriculum and required training for certain school district peace officers and school resource officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-04-17 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1972 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01972I.htm |