TX HB197 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring certain public institutions of higher education to post information regarding mental health resources on the institution's Internet website.
Title
Relating to requiring certain public institutions of higher education to post information regarding mental health resources on the institution's Internet website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - HB 197Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse