TX HB1958 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program.
Title
Relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-12 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1206 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
HB1899 (Same As) 2009-03-05 - Referred to Corrections
HB1899 (Same As) 2009-03-05 - Referred to Corrections
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF