TX HB1957 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the labeling of wine as originating from an area of this state or with the name of a vineyard in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the labeling of wine as originating from an area of this state or with the name of a vineyard in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-28 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-14HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenatePassed
2021-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-14SenateRecord vote
2021-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#132
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1957
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01957I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01957H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01957E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01957S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01957F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01957I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01957H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01957H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01957E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01957E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1957&RcdVtNo=132&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=15

Bill Comments

feedback