TX HB1947 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to licenses for insurance agents and adjusters.
Title
Relating to licenses for insurance agents and adjusters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1947Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--General
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions